THE BARBARIANS RUGBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to facilitate the development of the game of rugby football anywhere in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2004: Standard registration
- BARBARIANS TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Andrew Orr | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GAVIN HASTINGS OBE | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sir WILLIAM BLACKLEDGE BEAUMONT CBE | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN SOUTHERN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Gerald Reames Davies CBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.17k | £76.46k | £80.85k | £82.06k | £93.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.26k | £51.59k | £68.05k | £51.96k | £124.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) FOR THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF THE FACILITIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHICH WILL ENABLE PERSONS TO PLAY, ADMINISTER AND FURTHER THE GAME OF RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL, WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marsh Court Cottage
Marsh
WINCANTON
Somerset
BA9 9QZ
- Phone:
- 07770221558
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window