VOLUNTARY ACTION MELTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary Action Melton is a Community Hub providing a range of services directly to the people and communities of Melton Borough from our base in Melton Mowbray. We also work in local communities supporting community action and we provide a focus for local people to engage in volunteering and access to development support for local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £57,600 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 23 March 2004: Standard registration
- 23 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- VOLUNTARY ACTION MELTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.82k | £204.06k | £173.25k | £138.96k | £141.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366.32k | £215.07k | £158.56k | £128.03k | £214.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £58.20k | £57.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 10 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 08 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 08 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF MELTON BOROUGH AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES IN SUPPORT OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS OPERATING WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, INCLUDING BRINGING THESE TOGETHER IN COMMON EFFORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID COMMUNITY AND IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS WORKING WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window