WILDLIVES RESCUE AND REHABILITATION CENTRE EAST ANGLIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue, care, treatment, rehabilitation and release of wildlife to natural habitat. Education & training with regard to the care of wildlife and the necessary part they play in our world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 June 2004: Standard registration
- WILDLIVES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Ruth Jinkings | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Nezhad | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA FRANCES TYSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS ROSIE CATFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.33k | £53.91k | £65.10k | £48.33k | £94.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.30k | £51.11k | £45.58k | £38.18k | £62.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 March 2025 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 March 2025 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 7 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE CARE FOR INJURED, ORPHANED AND SICK WILDLIFE WITH THE ULTIMATE AIM OF RELEASING BACK INTO THE WILD. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT AND CREATE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE BENEFIT OF WILDLIFE BY THE USE OF EXHIBITION STANDS AND LECTURES IN EAST ANGLIA, AND BY PROVISION OF A NATIONAL TELEPHONE HELPLINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CATKINS
FRATING ROAD
THORRINGTON
COLCHESTER
CO7 8HT
- Phone:
- 01206251174
- Email:
- info@wildlives.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window