LAKELAND DISABILITY SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to assist people with physical disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 March 2004: Standard registration
- 23 June 2015: Funds received from 223270 THE HAMILTON MEMORIAL FUND
- 04 August 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LAKELAND DISABILITY SUPPORT (Working name)
- LAKELAND HOME FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- NEW HOLEHIRD (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.45k | £54.87k | £57.96k | £55.84k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.53k | £51.05k | £51.97k | £55.26k | £2.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 18 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 18 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 02/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CONSEQUENCES OF PHYSICAL DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF ACCOMMODATION, SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR THE SPIRITUAL, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE WHATEVER THEIR RACE, NATIONALITY, CREED, SEX OR AGE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window