THE LAURIE & GILLIAN MARSH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of the natural environment. The advancement of education of the public in the arts. The preservation and protection of good health in particular of women in the third world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN SARAH MARSH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bryan Courtney Aukett | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATIE MARSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.77k | £44.88k | £169.07k | £50.70k | £46.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.27k | £21.98k | £28.59k | £22.33k | £27.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 July 2024 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANT FUNDING TO REGISTERED CHARITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WHOSE OBJECTS ARE: A. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT B. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR OF WOMEN IN THE THIRD WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 GROVE END ROAD
LONDON
NW8 9LJ
- Phone:
- 02072896081
- Email:
- lauriemarsh@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window