Financial history OPERA EAST PRODUCTIONS

Charity number: 1102819
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £93.54k £10.97k £117.34k £93.02k £52.22k
Total expenditure £97.70k £5.02k £159.55k £69.62k £52.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A