PAUL HAMLYN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The foundation supports work in the UK and India. Its focus is on helping people to overcome disadvantage and lack of opportunity so that they can realise their potential and enjoy fulfilling and creative lives. It has a particular interest in supporting young people and a strong belief in the importance of the arts. It operates through grant making and related charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£72,021,659
Donations and legacies | £17.60k | |
Charitable activities | £762 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £10.01m | |
Other | £61.99m |
Total expenditure:
£72,116,450
Raising funds | £9.05m | |
Charitable activities | £63.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£47,893,451 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.05m | |
Charitable expenditure | £63.07m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.05m | |
Charitable expenditure | £63.07m | |
Retained for future use | £47.80m |
People

48 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 2005: Standard registration
- 17 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- THE PAUL HAMLYN FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE PAUL HAMLYN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE HAMLYN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Forster | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Dalle | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Marcus Davey | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Martha Beaton Mackenzie | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Silaja Birks | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Palakudiyil | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Akeela Ahmed | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL HAMLYN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES LINGWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TOM WYLIE OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.21m | £39.76m | £5.06m | £5.46m | £72.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.25m | £49.84m | £52.37m | £54.37m | £72.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.05m | £310.00k | N/A | £35.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.10m | £969.89k | £95.00k | £128.00k | £17.60k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £762 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £30.10m | £38.79m | £4.94m | £5.32m | £10.01m | |
|
Income - Other | £15.18k | £661 | £20.43k | £20.02k | £61.99m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £51.53m | £43.69m | £42.87m | £45.40m | £63.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.72m | £6.14m | £9.50m | £8.98m | £9.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £88.31k | £72.24k | £66.91k | £73.49k | £155.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £45.86m | £37.67m | £36.66m | £38.90m | £56.35m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.72m | £6.14m | £9.50m | £8.98m | £9.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.30m | £6.22m | £6.13m | £5.92m | £5.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £758.09m | £933.87m | £943.98m | £915.48m | £916.41m | |
|
Other assets | £22.96m | £7.91m | £7.05m | £4.82m | £3.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £50.91m | £42.44m | £42.03m | £50.88m | £64.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 12TH FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO BENEFIT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 13 June 2005 : Standard registration
- 17 March 2016 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAUL HAMLYN FOUNDATION
5-11 LEEKE STREET
LONDON
WC1X 9HY
- Phone:
- 02078123300
- Email:
- information@phf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window