IL CIRCOLO ITALIAN CULTURAL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is a UK-registered charity based in London. It fulfills an important role by creating a network of members of Italian nationality or with links to Italy, who share similar interests and wish to take part in the society's programme of activities. During the year a number of events are organised with the primary aim of promoting Italian culture and research in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francesca Di Fiore | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Vittoria Capanna | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raffaella Fabia Maria Cappello | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Rosemary Aylmer | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paola Girardi | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Alessandra Chieco Bianchi | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Antonietta Anna De Benedetti | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marina Vergani Bolgiani | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ludmila Pustka | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simona Spreafico | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.36k | £8.84k | £36.51k | £36.51k | £33.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.18k | £11.79k | £19.79k | £19.79k | £39.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/2012 as amended on 21 Jun 2018 as amended on 26 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22-24 ELY PLACE
LONDON
EC1N 6TE
- Phone:
- 02075663140
- Email:
- attivita@ilcircolo.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window