Trustees THE TYN-Y-NANT CHRISTIAN CENTRE
Charity number: 1102688

Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Harry Wright | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas Fleming | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Steven David Smith | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Heather Goodwin | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOEL GARRY FRASER | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE WOODS | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
NORMAN GRIFFITH GOODWIN CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.