KENT CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kent Cancer Trust aims to relieve the suffering of cancer patients and improve the provision of cancer care within Kent, particularly but not exclusively by developing and training medical staff, by promoting research into cancer leading to the development of new treatments and diagnostic aids and by educating the public in the cause and treatment of the disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 03 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KATHARINE MARY SCOTT WINSTONE | Chair | 31 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bridget Tripp | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARY BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIM BENTLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.55k | £10.66k | £6.26k | £10.42k | £29.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.38k | £8.71k | £27.06k | £12.09k | £10.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10 AUGUST 20044
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CANCER PATIENTS AND IMPROVE THE PROVISION OF CANCER CARE WITHIN THE KENT AREA PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING; 1) THE PROMOTION OF THE DEVELOPMENT AND TRAINING OF CANCER CLINICIANS, MEDICAL STAFF AND STUDENTS IN THE DISEASE. 2) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE AND TREATMENT OF CANCER AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS WITH A VIEW TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW TREATMENTS AND DIAGNOSTIC AIDS/ 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSE AND TREATMENT OF CANCER 4) SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 BLEAN COMMON
BLEAN
CANTERBURY
CT2 9JH
- Phone:
- 01227471602
- Email:
- info@kentcancertrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window