Financial history THE PARKER JOHNSON PRENTICE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1102866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.29k £1.33k £780 £787 £2.07k
Total expenditure £19.00k £0 £0 £10.00k £9.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A