THE DRAM CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 25 March 2004: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.54k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £4.43k | £1.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION, BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE DALTON, RAWTHORPE AND MOLDGREEN DISTRICT OF HUDDERSFIELD IN THE DISTRICT OF KIRKLEES, AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LIFELONG LEARNING; TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR SELF-EMPLOYMENT; THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK OR ANOTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE: SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF THE DALTON, RAWTHORPE AND MOLDGREEN DISTRICT OF HUDDERSFIELD IN THE DISTRICT OF KIRKLEES, AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window