FREEDOM TO LEARN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Freedom to Learn provides the opportunity of education to children from some of the remotest and poorest regions of the Himalayas working with non-profit organisations in India and Nepal with similar goals and ethos. FtL also partners with UK schools with their Sister Schools programme generating global friendships and partnership learning projects based within the UN SDG guidelines and framework.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 21 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Tebbutt | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Karuna Onta | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Adam Bentham | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
James Bruce Cresswell | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.51k | £79.64k | £142.35k | £43.88k | £58.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.38k | £71.69k | £155.31k | £40.45k | £51.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMETANL DEED DATED 24 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED ON 08 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EDUCATION TO CHILDREN LIVING IN NORTH INDIA AND NEPAL, AND, TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS ABOUT THE IMPORTANCE OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
HIMALAYAN REGION OF NORTH WEST INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Kennard Road
NEW MILTON
Hampshire
BH25 5JU
- Phone:
- 07557658495
- Email:
- info@freedomtolearn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window