BREAD AND WATER FOR AFRICA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main areas of activity are: - sustainable grant-making through partnerships with grass-roots non-governmental organisations (NGOs) in Africa; - Education and development programmes (website, programme tour/safari, programme conference and newsletter); - Research/ fact-finding site visits to Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Burundi
- Kenya
- Sierra Leone
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 07 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Street Child | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Dr ANTHONY WALLERSTEINER | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.65k | £178.02k | £126.94k | £75.22k | £26.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.23k | £279.30k | £176.78k | £34.67k | £9.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2021
(These accounts |
14 June 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 29 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT WITHIN AFRICA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY WORKING WITH AND ASSISTING MEMBERS OF LOCAL POPULATIONS TO BUILD VIABLE LIVELIHOODS, ENCOURAGING SELF-RELIANCE AND SUPPORTING SUSTAINABLE PROJECTS INITIATED BY THE INDIGENOUS POPULATION; AND B. ANY OTHER PURPOSES DEEMED CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bread and Water for Africa
33 Creechurch Lane
London
EC3A 5EB
- Phone:
- 02032890707
- Email:
- info@forafrica.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window