ANWAR-E-MADINA ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION CLASS 6 - 2ND YEAR FULL TIME. SPORTS DAY-OUT TRIPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 02 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED ISHTIAQ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Amer | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Aftab | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Awais Fiaz | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shahid Hussain | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.49k | £29.81k | £33.27k | £47.24k | £28.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.61k | £10.47k | £31.02k | £41.49k | £55.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JANUARY 2004, AS AMENDED 6 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE RAWALPINDI DIVISION OF PAKISTAN, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF FREE MODEL COLLEGES FOR THOSE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO ACCESS SUCH EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES DUE TO THEIR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES. B. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG RESIDENTS OR RURAL AREAS IN THE RAWALPINDI DIVISION OF PAKISTAN BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT FREE MEDICAL CENTRES.
Area of benefit
RAWALPINDI DIVISION OF PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
162 Ladypool Road
Sparkbrook
Birmingham
B12 8JS
- Phone:
- 07836546228
- Email:
- info@anwar-e-madina.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window