The Arts Society Blackmore Vale

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide services to our members to enable them to understand and enjoy the decorative and fine arts. Monthly lectures are held from October to July in Stalbridge, Dorset, and we arrange visits and Study Days. We also support arts initiatives in local schools. We record contents and artefacts in churches in our area and we provide church records. We are affiliated to the national body NADFAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 13 May 2004: Standard registration
- BVDFAS (Working name)
- BLACKMORE VALE DECORATIVE & FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Schofield | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Walton | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Torrance | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Margaret Martin | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||
ANTHEA PAYNE | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN LESLEY TASKER | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.75k | £4.70k | £13.13k | £12.10k | £11.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.57k | £6.70k | £9.32k | £10.90k | £11.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 05 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 06 MAY 2004 as amended on 06 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC. THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS, AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE CONSERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. (B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE PERSONS IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR STUDENTS IN ARTS PROJECTS, AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SEES FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STALBRIDGE IN DORSET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knapp House
Wyke Road
GILLINGHAM
Dorset
SP8 4NQ
- Phone:
- 07796954963
- Email:
- jillharrisuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
theartssocietyblackmorevale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window