LEIGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL- SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund Raising:- Trips and Visits Photograph Commission Uniform Sales Commission Sponsorship Expenditure:- Trips and Visits Sports/Special Events School Resources Charity Donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 26 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Jefferis | Chair | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Prechner | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Bernarde | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.06k | £12.44k | £67.86k | £47.21k | £36.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.18k | £7.95k | £53.87k | £36.23k | £30.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF LEIGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT (DFEE). IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
LEIGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL, LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEIGHTON MIDDLE SCHOOL
CHURCH SQUARE
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 1EX
- Phone:
- 01525374907
- Email:
- office@leighton.cbeds.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window