Financial history IBC UK (INFLAMMATORY BREAST CANCER UK)

Charity number: 1104375
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/05/2010
Total gross income £10.44k £22.08k £19.28k £21.96k £9.54k
Total expenditure £932 £6.94k £4.29k £3.00k £75.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A