IBC UK (INFLAMMATORY BREAST CANCER UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IBC UK raises awareness of inflammatory breast cancer and raises funds to support this work and to promote research into the cancer's causes and cure. Trustees regularly give talks to interested members of the public and to health professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 2004: Standard registration
- 27 July 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- IBC UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/05/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.44k | £22.08k | £19.28k | £21.96k | £9.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £932 | £6.94k | £4.29k | £3.00k | £75.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2010 | 29 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 26 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 03 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 10 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 10 October 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED 19 MAY 2004.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, ABOUT INFLAMMATORY BREAST CANCER AND IN PARTICULAR ITS IMPACT AND THE IMPORTANCE OF EARLY DIAGNOSIS, REFERRAL AND TREATMENT. 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND CURE OF IBG AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window