CHESTER FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) To promote and advance education in the fields of music, dance, speech and drama. (2) To promote and organise/assist in organising festivals at which music, dance speech & drama performances are given a platform and the benefit of suitably qualified professional adjudication and advice. (3) To provide a stage for artists who have taken part in the festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 29 April 2004: Standard registration
- CHESTER COMPETITIVE FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Rooney | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Bate | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MOYES | Trustee | 12 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN MOYES | Trustee | 12 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
LYNN MOYES | Trustee | 12 February 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £1 | £6.06k | £6.79k | £6.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.40k | £382 | £8.54k | £8.42k | £7.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2004 as amended on 17 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY IN THE FIELDS OF MUSIC, DANCE, SPEECH AND DRAMA; 2 TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE OR ASSIST IN ORGANISING FESTIVALS AT WHICH MUSIC, DANCE, SPEECH AND DRAMA PERFORMERS ARE GIVEN A PLATFORM AND THE BENEFIT OF SUITABLY QUALIFIED PROFESSIONAL ADJUDICATION AND ADVICE; 3 TO PROVIDE A STAGE FOR ARTISTS WHO HAVE TAKEN PART IN THE FESTIVAL[S].
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 BRYN AWELON
MOLD
CH7 1LT
- Phone:
- 07712454044
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window