SAFFRON HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Medical/Health/Sickness Disability Relief of Poverty Accommodation/Housing Sport/recreation Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Total income:
£24,388,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £24.39m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£17,831,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £17.83m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £17.83m | |
Retained for future use | £6.56m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 May 2004: Standard registration
- 16 September 2014: Removed (Exempt charity)
- SAFFRON HOUSING (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.37m | £19.96m | £22.23m | £22.47m | £24.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.61m | £15.74m | £15.80m | £16.24m | £17.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.37m | £19.96m | £22.23m | £22.47m | £24.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.61m | £15.74m | £15.80m | £16.24m | £17.83m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £59.57m | £71.62m | £77.24m | £107.82m | £123.88m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.63m | £4.05m | £12.53m | £8.37m | £6.54m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.60m | -£7.46m | -£1.87m | -£3.77m | -£5.65m | |
|
Total liabilities | £64.30m | £70.52m | £79.83m | £85.01m | £92.55m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 16 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 16 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 25 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 28 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 20 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/10/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/04/2012
Charitable objects
SAFFRON IS ESTABLISHED WITH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: I) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; II) PROVIDING FOR ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; III) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; IV) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION, LEISURE AND OTHER FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH SAFFRON OWNS OR MANAGED HOUSING STOCK; V) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH SAFFRON OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; VI) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; VII) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES AND HOUSING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH SAFFRON OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window