Accounts and annual returns THE SOURCE FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1106472
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 20 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2012 28 September 2013 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2011 23 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2010 22 October 2011 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required