Financial history THE SOURCE FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity Number: 1106472
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2009 31/10/2010 31/10/2011 31/10/2012 31/10/2013
Total gross income £0 £1.47k £545 £0 £0
Total expenditure £186 £71 £1.97k £75 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A