Financial history KING'S CLIFFE ENDOWED SCHOOL FUNDS

Charity number: 1104098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.12k £7.10k £7.83k £8.58k £2.83k
Total expenditure £14.02k £6.52k £7.82k £3.01k £3.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A