SWAZAID
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swazaid raises support for the people of Swaziland in their struggle with HIV/Aids. Our present focus is the welfare and education of orphans, and their protection from gender based abuse. We grant aid Swazi projects, assist and encourage voluntary work by people from the UK with the relevant skills, and promote links between communities here and Swazi counterparts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Eswatini
Governance
- 04 August 2004: Standard registration
- 07 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279 | £755 | £120 | £380 | £299 | |
|
Total expenditure | £398 | £10 | £2.77k | £60 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JULY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND 3. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF THE HIV/AIDS EPIDEMIC IN SWAZILAND.
Area of benefit
IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF HIV/AIDS IN SWAZILAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window