THE REFUGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims to relieve poverty, hardship and distress of African refugee living in Enfield. We do provide a free Interpreting & Translation services to members, provision of free advice on energy, health matters, education and training for employment, meeting and cultural activities, art development, food distribution and warm bank, sport and physical activities for these people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Berry Secretary | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annias Boyiki Advisor | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lingo Advisor | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lolofa Olinge Treasurer | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Antho Piti Advisor | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.88k | £9.93k | £14.83k | £14.99k | £9.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | £9.71k | £14.70k | £14.78k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 10 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HARINGEY, NORTH LONDON KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF A TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETATION SERVICE AND ADVICE REGARDING IMMIGRATION, HEALTH, WELFARE RIGHTS, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT ISSUES THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HARINGEY, NORTH LONDON, IN PARTICULAR THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING COURSES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR PROSPECTS OF GAINING EMPLOYMENT THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN HARINGEY, NORTH LONDON, IN PARTICULAR THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON SUCH MATTER AS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, DRUGS, ALCOHOL AND HIV/AIDS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HARINGEY, NORTH LONDON IN PARTICULAR THE CONGOLESE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN SPORT, IN PARTICULAR FOOTBALL
Area of benefit
HARINGEY, NORTH LONDON KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 COLLESS ROAD
LONDON
N15 4NR
- Phone:
- 07907001011
- Email:
- TRUSTTHEREFUGEE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window