AFRICA FOUNDATION FOR UGANDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF UGANDAN STREET CHILDREN, ORPHANS, ABANDONED BABIES AND VULNERABLE/DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN OF UGANDA IN EAST AFRICA BUT ALSO: 2. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES. 3. THE RELIEF OF SUCH CHILDREN/FAMILIES FROM CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Uganda
Governance
- 13 July 2004: Standard registration
- AFRICA FOUNDATION (Working name)
- OPEN ARMS CHILDREN CHARITY AFRICA FOUNDATION (Working name)
- OPEN ARMS CHILDREN'S CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER GASANA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES KIRIGWAJJO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEFA SEMPANGI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EPHURANCE NAKKAZI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £23.89k | £24.00k | £23.56k | £24.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £22.00k | £23.00k | £23.00k | £24.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2023 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2022 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 August 2021 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED 25 MAY 2004 AND 26 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF UGANDAN STREET CHILDREN, ORPHANS, ABANDONED BABIES AND VULNERABLE/DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN OF UGANDA IN EAST AFRICA BUT ALSO: 2. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES. 3. THE RELIEF OF SUCH CHILDREN/FAMILIES FROM CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
UGANDA IN EAST AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 BERKSHIRE ROAD
LONDON
E9 5LU
- Phone:
- 02085250941
- Email:
- info@africa-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window