SHEPWAY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shepway CAB aims to provide free, confidential, impartial and independent advice and information for the local community, influence on development of social policies and ensure individuals do not suffer through a lack of knowledge or inability to express their needs properly. In addition to general advice specialist advice is provided for welfare benefit, debt provision and housing possession.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £93,926 from 1 government contract(s) and £67,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 31 March 2004: Standard registration
- 27 March 2020: Funds received from 1140926 KENT AND MEDWAY CITIZENS ADVICE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Whitehead | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Gillen | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Alison McKay | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank Boland | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Godfrey Rainsley | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN DOUGLAS OAKES | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.07k | £256.38k | £261.60k | £191.19k | £234.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.81k | £258.06k | £252.58k | £237.24k | £247.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £131.99k | £133.47k | £89.79k | £93.93k | |
|
Income from government grants | £67.80k | £108.80k | £114.80k | £82.47k | £67.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE SHEPWAY DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
SHEPWAY, KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Units 4-6
Princes Gate
George Lane
Folkestone
Kent
CT20 1RH
- Phone:
- 01303661020
- Email:
- josephwardjones@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window