SHALFORD INFANTS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1102798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent Teacher Association. Raising funds for the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £7,593
Total expenditure: £8,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF SHALFORD INFANTS SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katelyn Silver Chair 28 September 2023
None on record
Christopher Crossley Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.03k £4.92k £9.53k £7.87k £7.59k
Total expenditure £10.14k £4.96k £445 £1.50k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SHALFORD INFANT SCHOOL
STATION ROW
SHALFORD
GUILDFORD
GU4 8BY
Phone:
01483 562143