Financial history FRIENDS OF PARKFIELDS

Charity Number: 1103060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/08/2020 20/08/2021 20/08/2022 20/08/2023 20/08/2024
Total gross income £3.89k £232 £0 £15 £131
Total expenditure £1.94k £1.02k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A