NORTH EAST LAW CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newcastle Law Centre was established in 1978 to promote access to legal justice and promote social justice and serve the needs of traditionally oppressed groups and those whose access to the legal system is restricted. The Law Centre seeks to achieve this by employing a variety of methods of work, including individual casework and advice work, training , and provision of meeting place facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£944,459
Donations and legacies | £490 | |
Charitable activities | £845.97k | |
Other trading activities | £97.51k | |
Investments | £490 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£891,849
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £891.85k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £71,685 from 2 government contract(s) and £568,130 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £891.85k | |
Retained for future use | £52.61k |
People

21 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 17 September 2004: Standard registration
- BENWELL COMMUNITY LAW CENTRE LTD (Previous name)
- BENWELL COMMUNITY LAW PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- NEWCASTLE COMMUNITY LAW CENTRE (Previous name)
- NEWCASTLE LAW CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles John Whittle | Chair | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cockburn | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dafni Lima | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Flounders | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maximilien Tse | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Hopkins | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Atoosa Khatiri | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Jane Proud | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £518.19k | £883.39k | £743.91k | £735.90k | £944.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.81k | £614.26k | £707.66k | £773.45k | £891.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £85.00k | £165.58k | £20.53k | £71.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | £65.95k | £85.00k | £60.00k | £125.52k | £568.13k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.09k | £11.33k | £1.38k | £1.62k | £490 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £18.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £97.51k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £488.70k | £872.05k | £742.52k | £734.18k | £845.97k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £150 | £0 | £11 | £102 | £490 | |
|
Income - Other | £6.52k | £14 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £500.11k | £614.26k | £707.66k | £768.21k | £891.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.70k | £0 | £0 | £5.23k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £200.07k | £459.23k | £627.42k | £496.68k | £481.70k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £105.60k | £95.63k | £227.58k | £134.38k | £66.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 JULY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS (FOR A CHANGE OF NAME) EFFECTIVE FROM 07 NOVEMBER 1984, 11 SEPTEMBER 1986 AND 24 FEBRUARY 1995 AND A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PEOPLE LIVING, WORKING OR HAVING A CONNECTION WITH THE DESIGNATED AREA: TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS IN NEED WITH LEGAL AND RELATED SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE OBTAIN THROUGH LACK OF MEANS OR RESOURCES, IN PARTICULAR BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING ONE OR MORE INDEPENDENT LAW CENTRES AND AN OUTREACH SERVICE IN LIAISON WITH OTHER CHARITIES, COMMUNITY GROUPS AND STATUTORY BODIES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE LAW AND THE PRACTICE OF THE LAW AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE, HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY FOR THOSE AREAS OF THE LAW WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR CONCERN TO PEOPLE IN POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR FACING DISCRIMINATION OR WHICH ARE DIRECTED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR REDUCING DISCRIMINATION; TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF MINORITY OR DISADVANTAGED GROUPS IN SUCH WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY BODIES OPERATING IN THE DESIGNATED AREA, PARTICULARLY THOSE WORKING WITH PERSONS IN POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR WITH MEMBERS OF MINORITY OR DISADVANTAGED GROUPS, BY PROVIDING LEGAL AND RELATED SERVICES TO SUCH CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY BODIES FOR FREE OR AT REDUCED RATES OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10-13 Saville Row
Newcastle Upon Tyne
NE1 8JE
- Phone:
- 01912304777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window