Financial history FRIENDS OF LAYFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1102861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £6.96k £4.34k £2.75k £2.47k £4.99k
Total expenditure £4.45k £2.90k £5.74k £1.66k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A