Accounts and annual returns KIBAM KE FON

Charity Number: 1104468
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2005 22 February 2006 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2005 Not Required