THE ARTS SOCIETY CANTAB

Charity Number: 1103509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Society are the promotion and advancement of the aesthetic education of the public, the cultivation, appreciation and study of the finer arts and the giving of aid to the preservation of our national artistic heritage for the benefit of the public. The Committee arranges lectures and also visits to sites of artistic and historic interest.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,989
Total expenditure: £7,343

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CAMOFAS (Working name)
  • CAM DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RODERICK ASHBY-JOHNSON Trustee 06 October 2021
CAMBRIDGE EYE TRUST
Received: On time
IAN philip CHAMBERLAIN Trustee 07 June 2012
THE ARTS SOCIETY SOUTH CAMBS
Received: On time
MARGARET ANN SANDERSON Trustee 07 June 2012
THE FRIENDS OF SEDGWICK MUSEUM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.41k £6.12k £6.40k £6.77k £6.99k
Total expenditure £9.34k £5.25k £6.34k £7.09k £7.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 ORWELL ROAD
BARRINGTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 7SE
Phone:
01223872243
Website:

theartssocietycantab.org.uk