Governing document THE ARTS SOCIETY CANTAB
Charity Number: 1103509

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 8 MARCH 2004 AND 12 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAY 2017 as amended on 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE FINE ARTS, AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE PRESERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.