Financial history NOTTINGHAMSHIRE SEXUAL VIOLENCE SUPPORT SERVICES LTD

Charity Number: 1103071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.11m £1.71m £1.96m £2.04m £2.12m
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.58m £1.96m £2.24m £1.99m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.62m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.11m £1.71m £331.29k £330.79k £1.73m
Income - Donations and legacies £770.12k £1.30m £335.96k £332.24k £386.93k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £335.44k £411.38k £1.62m £1.71m £1.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £979 £282 £28 £332 £332
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.58m £1.96m £2.24m £1.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £53.55k £0 £29.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0