Governing document NOTTINGHAMSHIRE SEXUAL VIOLENCE SUPPORT SERVICES LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 APRIL 2005 AND 19 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUL 2017 as amended on 13 Jul 2022 as amended on 16 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE TRAUMA, DISTRESS AND/OR SUFFERING OF VICTIMS OF RAPE, INDECENT ASSAULT AND ALL OTHER FORMS OF SEXUAL ABUSE, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION SEXUAL HARASSMENT (THE 'CRISIS ISSUES')
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.