PRIDE LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote equality and diversity for the public benefit in the United Kingdom and in particular the elimination of discrimination on the ground of sexual orentation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2004: Standard registration
- 25 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.16k | £237.01k | £306.34k | £232.68k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.16k | £184.40k | £297.31k | £257.97k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 31 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 31 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED ON 2 MARCH 2004 , AMENDED ON 28 APRIL 2004(CLAUSES 3 & 4 (1).
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUND OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION BY I. RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY AND ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN GAY BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDERED PEOPLE BY PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION ; II. CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF LESBIAN GAY BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDERED COMMUNITIES BY THE USE OF PUBLICATIONS, CODES OF PRACTICE, THE MEDIA AND PUBLIC ADVOCACY: III. ADVANCING EDUCATION IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING OR PRODUCING MATERIALS: IV. ASSOCIATING VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENTAL, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS RUN BY AND FOR LESBIANS, GAY MEN, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDERED PEOPLE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO :- A. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THESE ORGANISATIONS TO PROMOTE THEIR WORK/SERVICES TO WIDER AUDIENCES, B. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THESE ORGANISATIONS TO SHARE INFORMATION AND TO WORK TOGETHER.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window