EVERING PENTECOSTAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Day-Care facilities for the elderly and weekly activities where they attend the venue to engage in crafts, physical exercise, health awareness programmes and awareness of their personal entitlements in the community. We also provide educational programmes including religious awareness for the young people. We also provide music education to selected individuals. We train young singers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Haringey
Governance
- 27 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Clemones Daley | Trustee | 16 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Carlton Farrell | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MONICA FAGON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £6.50k | £8.70k | £9.87k | £8.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £4.50k | £7.50k | £8.70k | £7.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 11 JULY 2004 AND 27 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THE YOUNG AND AGED IN AN EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SUFFIELD ROAD
LONDON
N15 5JX
- Phone:
- 02082117532
- Email:
- church@evering.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window