Financial history AFRICAN REFUGEE WOMEN ("NZOTO YA NKOLO")

Charity number: 1104447
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.92k £14.92k £15.00k £14.95k £15.00k
Total expenditure £14.91k £14.91k £14.90k £14.91k £14.95k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.76k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A