HIGHFIELD EARLY YEARS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity is that of providing full day childcare for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 August 2004: Standard registration
- 12 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.49k | £222.15k | £283.36k | £296.44k | £266.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.18k | £207.44k | £249.89k | £292.89k | £316.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 March 2015 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 11 March 2015 | 39 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 06 March 2014 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 10 March 2014 | 38 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE; B) THE PROVISION OF CARE, RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN OUTSIDE NORMAL SCHOOL HOURS; C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PARENTS IN ALL ASPECTS OF CHILD DEVELOPMENT D) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PARENTS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN MATTERS SUCH AS WELFARE RIGHTS, HEALTH, EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
CHORLEY, LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window