THE PRIME TRUST (CYMRU)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting people fifty and above towards economic activity and retention within economic activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
- 07 June 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 07 June 2012: Funds transferred to 1140129 PRIME CYMRU
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.44k | £72.49k | £0 | £51.76k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £698 | £1.18k | £1.18k | £13.86k | £108.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 26 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 27 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 21 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT WITH PARTICULAR REGARD, BUT NOT SOLELY RESTRICTED TO, THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF SELF-EMPLOYMENT AMONG MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WHO ARE OVER THE AGE OF 50, WHO ARE NOT ENGAGED IN PAID EMPLOYMENT AND WHO WOULD BENEFIT THROUGH ENHANCED INCOME, OPPORTUNITIES FOR ENGAGEMENT IN MEANINGFUL ACTIVITY AND THE PREVENTION OF SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window