STARS FOUNDATION FOR CEREBRAL PALSY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds in order to assist with the relief of those with cerebral palsy and also their families and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
- 29 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 October 2024: Funds transferred to 1089657 DAME VERA LYNN CHILDREN'S CHARITY
- SOS (Working name)
- STARS ORGANISATION SUPPORTING CEREBRAL PALSY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.88k | £6.34k | £3 | £71 | £116.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.27k | £28.81k | £19.96k | £1.73k | £135.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 JANUARY 2004, 24 MAY 2005 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSON WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND THE RELIEF OF THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF PERSONS WITH CEREBRAL PALSY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window