Financial history JUNIOR LEAGUE OF LONDON

Charity number: 1103298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £160.42k £133.84k £116.11k £145.05k £109.10k
Total expenditure £150.49k £137.36k £133.28k £153.53k £134.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A