ALI MEMORIAL CENTRE (AMC)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING RELIEF OF EDUCATION,HEALTH,TRAINING AND POVERTY ISSUES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 June 2004: Standard registration
- 13 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- AMC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.78k | £9.59k | £11.41k | £12.80k | £12.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.68k | £9.54k | £7.77k | £10.91k | £15.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCE RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND TRAINING OR IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window