Financial history THE WILTSHIRE AND DORSET DEAF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103335
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £22.12k £37.44k £18.50k £52.39k £46.30k
Total expenditure £23.85k £27.65k £24.14k £35.60k £33.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k N/A N/A N/A