HORSLEY PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMMUNITY BASED PLAYGROUP OFFERING CHILDCARE FOR CHILDREN FROM 2 YEARS 9 MONTHS TO START OF SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £54,799 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 April 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Beskeen Ms | Chair | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Charlesworth | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Flora Davies | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Howells | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Vaughan | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JEAN RATFORD | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Jessica Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.90k | £42.23k | £33.21k | £60.31k | £68.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.79k | £39.45k | £36.49k | £55.54k | £68.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £26.58k | £44.37k | £54.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.23k | N/A | £498 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 01 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
HORSLEY, STROUD, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARK VIEW
HARTLEY BRIDGE
HORSLEY
STROUD
GL6 0QB
- Phone:
- 01453833876
- Email:
- mick.ratford@fmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window