Financial history THE CHURCHILL SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1102983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/09/2019 18/09/2020 18/09/2021 18/09/2022 18/09/2023
Total gross income £16.11k £8.78k £7.38k £12.02k £13.84k
Total expenditure £13.35k £14.26k £6.42k £14.43k £10.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A