THE FUSILIERS MUSEUM AND LEARNING CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of museum facilities for the collections of the Lancashire Fusiliers and the Royal Regiment of Fusiliers and to provide access for people of all ages, background and level of ability to these collections for their enjoyment, education and research, whilst ensuring that the collections are appropriately safeguarded.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £66,804 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 2006: Standard registration
- THE HERITAGE LEARNING CENTRE AND MUSEUM "FUSILIERS" LANCASHIRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLONEL BRIAN GORSKI OBE, MBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Glyn Potts | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abed Hussain | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grace Mehta | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Bentley | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Amanda Marsh | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Iain MacDoanald Hallam | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Metcalfe | Trustee | 05 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karan Patricia Lee | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL RETD James William Denny MBE MA | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £484.66k | £356.35k | £380.06k | £257.49k | £384.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £551.77k | £303.07k | £341.56k | £290.09k | £267.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £62.00k | N/A | N/A | £66.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 October 2020 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 October 2020 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE LANCASHIRE FUSILIERS, ROYAL REGIMENT OF FUSILIERS AND ANY SUCCESSORS TO THESE BODIES ('PARTICIPATING REGIMENTS') IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE PARTICIPATING REGIMENTS BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM ('MUSEUM') TO PRESERVE AND EXHIBIT MATERIAL RELATING TO THE PARTICIPATING REGIMENTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverside House
Alswear
South Molton Devon
Alswear
South Molton Devon
- Phone:
- 0161763961
- Email:
- enquiries@fusiliermuseum.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window