WILKINSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To make grants to charitable organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £5,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY HARWICK WILKINSON Chair
None on record
WENNA JERMAN THOMPSON Trustee 02 October 2017
None on record
LISA JOANNE WILKINSON Trustee
None on record
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH WILKINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £66 £2.90k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £697 £2.18k £55.42k £549 £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mellor Oxland LLP
Hine House
25 Regent Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 5BS
Phone:
01159644900
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available